Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 157 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 1286 Week
» 15543 Month
» 243427 Year
» 1464992 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 920 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 9920 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 9157 m/e 11/1946
BR 69157 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19841
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Wed 09/04/1958 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 07/1958 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 09/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKD Parkhead w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   09/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) (Uncertain) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 920
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19841
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9920    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9157    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69157    
09/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69157 from Parkhead (65C)    

prev prev