Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1070 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 1070 Week
» 7204 Month
» 235088 Year
» 1456653 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 917 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 9917 m/e 07/1924
LNER (1946) 9154 m/e 11/1946
BR 69154 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19838
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Wed 18/11/1959 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During y/e 1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 8w/e 31/08/1957
64A St Margarets 4w/e 05/07/1958
   Withdrawn 18/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   18/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 917
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19838
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9917    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9154    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69154    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
18/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69154 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev