|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
04/01/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped: 42262/9, D361, D6142 an 61397. Scrapped: 69135/50, 69224. Being Scrapped: 65334, 68101. In Shops: 64592/7, D261/3. | SLS/196302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 913 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19834 |
||
07/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9913 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9150 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69150 | ||
31/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69150 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |