Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 993 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 993 Week
» 7127 Month
» 235011 Year
» 1456576 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 913 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 9913 m/e 07/1925
LNER (1946) 9150 m/e 06/1946
BR 69150 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19834
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 50 yrs, 2 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
THJ Thornton Junction 01/01/1948
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 8w/e 31/08/1957
64A St Margarets 4w/e 10/05/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 913
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19834
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9913    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9150    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69150    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69150 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev