Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 106 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5450 Week
» 6340 Month
» 314321 Year
» 1198702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 908 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 9908 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 9145 m/e 04/1946
BR 69145 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19829
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Fri 11/03/1960 off Polmadie (66A)
Scrapping During 05/1960 at Connels (Calder)
Service Life 47 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PKD Parkhead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn 11/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EFD Eastfield 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC PKD Parkhead 24/08/1947
ALLOC KPS Kipps w/e 03/04/1948
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   11/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as NBR Number 908
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19829
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9908    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9145    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69145    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69145 from Polmadie (66A)    
05/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Connels: Calder    

prev prev