Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1032 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 1032 Week
» 7166 Month
» 235050 Year
» 1456615 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 907 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 9907 m/e 01/1926
LNER (1946) 9144 m/e 09/1946
BR 69144 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19828
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Thu 25/02/1960 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 04/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 47 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1912
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 25/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   25/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1948 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. SLS/194801
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 907
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19828
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9907    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9144    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
08/1948 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69144    
25/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69144 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev