Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 100 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1227 Week
» 12520 Month
» 277153 Year
» 1498718 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 399 m/e 08/1910
LNER (1924) 9399 m/e 04/1924
LNER (1946) 9143 on 17/02/1946
BR 69143 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19176
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1910
Withdrawal Fri 16/09/1960 off Motherwell (66B)
Scrapping During 02/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 50 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1910
PKD Parkhead on 01/01/1948
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
66B Motherwell 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 16/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   on 16/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 399
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19176
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9399    
17/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9143    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69143    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
16/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69143 from Motherwell (66B)    

prev prev