Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 99 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1226 Week
» 12519 Month
» 277152 Year
» 1498717 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 397 m/e 08/1910
LNER (1924) 9397 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 9141 m/e 08/1946
BR 69141 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19174
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1910
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1960 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 07/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 50 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1910
KPS Kipps on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 02/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 08/08/1949
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 01/10/1949
WDN   on 02/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 397
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19174
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9397    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9141    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69141    
02/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69141 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev