Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 132 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 1261 Week
» 15518 Month
» 243402 Year
» 1464967 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 393 m/e 07/1910
LNER (1924) 9393 m/e 12/1925
LNER (1946) 9139 on 10/02/1946
BR 69139 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19172
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/04/1958 off Carlisle Canal (68E)
Scrapping During 07/1958 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 47 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1910
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 26/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 26/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. SLS/195004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 393
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19172
   
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9393    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9139    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69139    
26/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69139 from Carlisle Canal (68E)    

prev prev