Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 19 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3567 Week
» 4457 Month
» 312438 Year
» 1196819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 392 m/e 07/1910
LNER (1924) 9392 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 9138 m/e 06/1946
BR 69138 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19171
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at P.W. McLellan (Langloan)
Service Life 52 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 06/07/1957
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 28/09/1957
64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1948 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as NBR Number 392
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19171
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9392    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9138    
01/1948 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69138    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
28/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69138 from St Margarets (64A)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by McLellans: Langloan    

prev prev