Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 800 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 4376 Month
» 312357 Year
» 1196738 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 390 m/e 07/1910
LNER (1924) 9390 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9136 m/e 12/1946
BR 69136 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19169
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal Thu 11/05/1961 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 07/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 50 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 8w/e 31/08/1957
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn 11/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   11/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as NBR Number 390
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19169
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9390    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9136    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69136    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69136 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
07/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev