Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 840 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18643 Week
» 71659 Month
» 191186 Year
» 3218039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
389 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9389 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9135 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
69135 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
Shopped: 42262/9, D361, D6142 an 61397. Scrapped: 69135/50, 69224. Being Scrapped: 65334, 68101. In Shops: 64592/7, D261/3. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 389 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19168 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9389 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9135 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69135 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
05/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69135 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|