Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 287 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5795 Week
» 26697 Month
» 26697 Year
» 1248262 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 389 m/e 07/1910
LNER (1924) 9389 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 9135 m/e 20/01/1946
BR 69135 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19168
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 52 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 8w/e 31/08/1957
64A St Margarets 4w/e 05/07/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as NBR Number 389
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19168
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9389    
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9135    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69135    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69135 from St Margarets (64A)    
02/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev