Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 249 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3268 Week
» 10452 Month
» 318433 Year
» 1202814 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 386 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 9386 m/e 01/1926
LNER (1946) 9132 m/e 20/01/1946
BR 69132 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19165
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal Fri 18/11/1960 off Motherwell (66B)
Scrapping During 01/1961 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 50 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
THJ Thornton Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66B Motherwell 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn 18/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   18/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as NBR Number 386
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19165
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9386    
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9132    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69132    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69132 from Motherwell (66B)    
01/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev