Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14304 Week
» 67320 Month
» 186847 Year
» 3213700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
386 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9386 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9132 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
69132 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
19/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 386 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19165 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9386 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9132 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69132 |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
18/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69132 from Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|