Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 959 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 959 Week
» 7093 Month
» 234977 Year
» 1456542 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 209 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 9209 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 9128 m/e 10/1946
BR 69128 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19161
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 52 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1910
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 01/01/1948
64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/06/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 209
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19161
   
10/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9209    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9128    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69128    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69128 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev