Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 256 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3275 Week
» 10459 Month
» 318440 Year
» 1202821 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 154 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 9154 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 9127 m/e 11/1946
BR 69127 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19160
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal Tue 16/06/1959 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 09/1959 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 49 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 8w/e 31/08/1957
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 10/05/1958
   Withdrawn 16/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   16/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1925 Vacuum Ejector fitted
10/1953 Steam Brake fitted
10/1953 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as NBR Number 154
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19160
   
11/1925 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9154    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9127    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69127    
10/1953 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
10/1953 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69127 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
09/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev