Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 999 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 999 Week
» 7133 Month
» 235017 Year
» 1456582 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 7 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 9007 m/e 03/1924
LNER (1946) 9126 m/e 05/1946
BR 69126 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L394
Works Number 19159
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 12/02/1962 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Clarkston, Atlas Steelworks (Lanark)
Service Life 51 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1910
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 8w/e 31/08/1957
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 18/01/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW STR Stratford 03/03/1948
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 25/01/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   w/e 12/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1925 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 7
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19159
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9007    
03/1925 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9126    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69126    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
18/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
12/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69126 from Dawsholm (65D)    

prev