Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1033 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14439 Week
» 67455 Month
» 186982 Year
» 3213835 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
156 |
m/e |
03/1914 |
North Eastern Railway |
3156 |
y/e |
1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2537 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9119 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69119 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Stirling |
Class |
N13 |
Company History |
HBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3017 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/07/1955 off Neville Hill (50B) |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/07/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1934 |
LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 156 |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3156 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2537 |
|
|
08/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9119 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69119 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
05/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69119 from Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|