Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 485 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4997 Week
» 27503 Month
» 330693 Year
» 1552258 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 156 m/e 03/1914
North Eastern Railway 3156 y/e 1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2537 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9119 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69119 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class N13
Company History HBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N1303/1914
Wheels 0-6-2T
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3017
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1914
Withdrawal Tue 05/07/1955 off Neville Hill (50B)
Service Life 41 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1914
HLS Hull Springhead on 01/01/1948
50B Neville Hill 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn on 05/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   on 05/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1934 LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 156    
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 3156    
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2537    
08/1934 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9119    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69119    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
05/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69119 from Neville Hill (50B)    

prev