Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 551 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 5063 Week
» 27569 Month
» 330759 Year
» 1552324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 23 m/e 12/1913
North Eastern Railway 3023 y/e 1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2415 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9113 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69113 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class N13
Company History HBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N1312/1913
Wheels 0-6-2T
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3011
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1913
Withdrawal w/e Mon 04/05/1953 off Neville Hill (50B)
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1913
HLS Hull Springhead on 01/01/1948
50B Neville Hill 5w/e 17/01/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 04/05/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN THJ Thornton Junction on 05/07/1947
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   w/e 04/05/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1932 LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Cowlairs Works On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 23    
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 3023    
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2415    
12/1932 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9113    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69113    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
04/05/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 69113 from Neville Hill (50B)    

prev prev