Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 126 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1263 Week
» 31553 Month
» 334743 Year
» 1556308 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 15 m/e 12/1913
North Eastern Railway 3015 y/e 1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2407 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9111 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69111 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class N13
Company History HBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N1312/1913
Wheels 0-6-2T
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3009
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1913
Withdrawal Thu 21/08/1952 off Hull Springhead (53C)
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1913
HLS Hull Springhead on 01/01/1948
53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 23/12/1950
   Withdrawn on 21/08/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN STM St Margarets on 31/12/1947
ALLOC HLA   w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   on 21/08/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1931 LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 15    
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 3015    
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2407    
01/1931 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9111    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69111    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/08/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 69111 from Hull Springhead (53C)    

prev prev