Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2063 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19866 Week
» 72882 Month
» 192409 Year
» 3219262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1785 |
m/e |
04/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9108 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
British Railways |
69108 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
N10 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 30/07/1957 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1903 |
HLD |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/07/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/07/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1946 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1946 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
12/1946 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted |
12/1954 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1903 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1785 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9108 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69108 |
|
|
12/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
30/07/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69108 |
|
|
08/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|