Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 503 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7957 Week
» 10539 Month
» 275172 Year
» 1496737 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1699 m/e 03/1903
LNER (1946) 9105 m/e 09/1946
BR 69105 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal Fri 16/06/1961
Scrapping During 07/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1903
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 23/12/1950
52A Gateshead w/e 02/05/1959
   Withdrawn on 16/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   on 16/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1931 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1944 Vacuum Ejector removed
02/1944 Steam Brake fitted
02/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1699
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1931 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9105    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69105    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
16/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69105    

prev prev