Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 124 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 3984 Week
» 6566 Month
» 271199 Year
» 1492764 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1148 m/e 12/1902
LNER (1946) 9101 on 10/02/1946
BR 69101 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal Mon 09/04/1962
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 59 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1902
NLN Northallerton 01/01/1948
54A Sunderland 4w/e 17/02/1951
54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 19/07/1958
52A Gateshead w/e 02/05/1959
   Withdrawn 09/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   09/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1944 Vacuum Ejector removed
03/1944 Steam Brake fitted
03/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1148
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1944 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
03/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9101    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northallerton (NLN)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69101    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
09/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69101    

prev prev