Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 571 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8025 Week
» 10607 Month
» 275240 Year
» 1496805 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1132 m/e 12/1902
LNER (1946) 9099 on 10/03/1946
BR 69099 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal Mon 10/02/1958
Scrapping During 02/1958
Service Life 55 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1902
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 10/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
WDN   on 10/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1945 Steam Brake fitted
06/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
06/1945 Vacuum Ejector removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1132
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
06/1945 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
06/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9099    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69099    
10/02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69099    

prev prev