Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 604 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8058 Week
» 10640 Month
» 275273 Year
» 1496838 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1109 m/e 12/1902
LNER (1946) 9097 on 10/02/1946
BR 69097 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal Mon 09/04/1962
Scrapping During 08/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1902
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 09/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 09/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1944 Steam Brake fitted
09/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed
09/1944 Vacuum Ejector removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1109
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
09/1944 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
09/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9097    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69097    
09/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69097    

prev prev