Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 538 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7992 Week
» 10574 Month
» 275207 Year
» 1496772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 89 m/e 12/1902
LNER (1946) 9095 m/e 08/1946
BR 69095 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal Tue 25/10/1955
Scrapping During 11/1955
Service Life 52 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1902
BLA Blaydon on 01/01/1948
52A Gateshead 4w/e 19/07/1952
   Withdrawn on 25/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   on 25/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1947 Westinghouse Brake removed
11/1947 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 89
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9095    
11/1947 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1947 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69095    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
25/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69095    

prev prev