Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 587 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8041 Week
» 10623 Month
» 275256 Year
» 1496821 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1683 m/e 11/1902
LNER (1946) 9092 m/e 04/1946
BR 69092 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Mon 06/04/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1902
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
BOR Borough Gardens m/e 12/1949
   Withdrawn on 06/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC BOR Borough Gardens w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC GHD Gateshead w/e 28/01/1950
WDN   on 06/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1947 Westinghouse Brake removed
09/1947 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1683
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9092    
09/1947 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
09/1947 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69092    
06/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69092    

prev prev