Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 95 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4732 Week
» 16025 Month
» 280658 Year
» 1502223 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1654 m/e 12/1893
LNER (1946) 9426 m/e 10/1946
BR 69426 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N912/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal w/e Mon 23/02/1953
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1893
AUK West Auckland by 01/01/1923
DAR Darlington on 01/01/1948
54A Sunderland 4w/e 17/02/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 23/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 04/02/1951
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock w/e 17/11/1951
WDN   w/e 23/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1923 Westinghouse Brake fitted
03/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
06/1946 Steam Brake fitted
01/1949 Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1654
Built at Darlington Works
   
1923 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK)    
03/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9426    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR)    
01/1949 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69426    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
23/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 69426    

prev prev