Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 303 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3758 Week
» 15051 Month
» 279684 Year
» 1501249 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1652 m/e 12/1893
LNER (1946) 9424 m/e 12/1946
BR 69424 m/e 02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N912/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal Mon 27/06/1955
Service Life 61 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1893
AFP Annfield Plain by 01/01/1923
PEL   on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 27/06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 06/11/1948
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock w/e 17/11/1951
WDN   on 27/06/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1947 Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1652
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annfield Plain (AFP)    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9424    
07/1947 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation      
02/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 69424    
27/06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69424    

prev prev