Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 281 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3736 Week
» 15029 Month
» 279662 Year
» 1501227 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 69423   Not applied
NER 1651 m/e 12/1893
LNER (1946) 9423 m/e 07/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N912/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal During 07/1951
Service Life 57 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1893
EHL East Hartlepool by 01/01/1923
NLN Northallerton on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NLN Northallerton on 04/05/1947
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   on 09/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1923 Westinghouse Brake fitted
12/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
03/1945 Steam Brake fitted
12/1947 Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 69423 but not taken up    
12/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1651
Built at Darlington Works
   
1923 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - East Hartlepool (EHL)    
12/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9423    
12/1947 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northallerton (NLN)    
07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 9423    

prev prev