Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15078 Week
» 68094 Month
» 187621 Year
» 3214474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69423 |
|
Not applied |
North Eastern Railway |
1651 |
m/e |
12/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9423 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
N9 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1893 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1951 |
Service Life |
57 yrs , 7 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NLN |
Northallerton |
on |
04/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
SUN |
Sunderland |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/07/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1923 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
12/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1947 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 69423 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1893 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1651 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|
|
01/01/1923 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - East Hartlepool (EHL) |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9423 |
|
|
12/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northallerton (NLN) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9423 |
|
|