Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 120 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1257 Week
» 31547 Month
» 334737 Year
» 1556302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1104 m/e 12/1889
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9400 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 69400 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N804/1890
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 04/1890
Withdrawal During 10/1951
Service Life 61 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1890
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock w/e 06/11/1948
WDN   on 22/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1889 Renumbered Renumbered to 1104    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9400    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69400 but not taken up    
10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 9400