Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 120 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1257 Week
» 31547 Month
» 334737 Year
» 1556302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 961 m/e 11/1889
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9398 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69398 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N804/1890
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 04/1890
Withdrawal Mon 15/10/1951
Service Life 61 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1890
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 15/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/10/1948
WDN   on 15/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1889 Renumbered Renumbered to 961    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9398    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69398    
15/10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 69398    

prev