Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 3892 Week
» 526 Month
» 337372 Year
» 1558937 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 76 m/e 05/1889
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9394 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 69394 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N802/1890
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 02/1890
Withdrawal Mon 03/10/1955
Service Life 65 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1890
CON Consett on 01/01/1948
54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 20/02/1954
   Withdrawn on 03/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 5w/e 27/02/1954
WDN   on 03/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1889 Renumbered Renumbered to 76    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9394    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Consett (CON)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69394    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
03/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69394    

prev