Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 127 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1264 Week
» 31554 Month
» 334744 Year
» 1556309 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 515 m/e 04/1889
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9391 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69391 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N811/1889
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1889
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/02/1953
Service Life 63 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1889
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948
52B Heaton 4w/e 20/01/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 16/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOR Borough Gardens w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 52B Heaton m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   w/e 16/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1889 Renumbered Renumbered to 515    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9391    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69391    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
16/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 69391