Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 119 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1256 Week
» 31546 Month
» 334736 Year
» 1556301 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 345 m/e 04/1889
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9390 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69390 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N811/1889
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1889
Withdrawal Thu 18/10/1956
Service Life 66 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1889
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
54D Consett 4w/e 20/09/1952
54A Sunderland 4w/e 20/02/1954
54B Tyne Dock 3w/e 12/11/1955
   Withdrawn on 18/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 05/11/1955
WDN   on 18/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/02/1954 Newcastle-Consett passenger service The Newcastle-Consett passenger service is now worked via Birtley only, as from 1st February all stations on the Blackhill-Scotswood section have been closed to passenger traffic. This is the Derwent Valley line, a connecting link on which the L.N.W.R. cast covetous eyes in the 1860's with a view to entering Newcastle via the Tebay-Bishop Auckland-Tow Law line. The N8 No. 69390 worked the last 'full circle' train Newcastle-Newcastle via Blackhill on 30th January. SLS/195404

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1889 Renumbered Renumbered to 345    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9390    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69390    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (54D)    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
18/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 69390    

prev