Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 709 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14115 Week
» 67131 Month
» 186658 Year
» 3213511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1152 |
m/e |
12/1888 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9385 |
on |
03/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69385 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
N8 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 04/1889 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Wed 27/10/1954 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1889 |
WAS |
|
Waskerley |
H |
12/1935 |
HLD |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/10/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/10/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1954 |
Darlington Works |
Darlington Works have completed Class '2' B.R. engines up to No. 78039 and withdrawal of old N.E.R. types has speeded up recently. Nos. 69770, 69385, 68258, 68292 (this engine had the extra hanging buffers for shunting the old cauldron wagons long since gone), 68304, 65661/7/86/705/10, and 62358/71/4/80/89. 62371 is of note as she is one of the 1942 rebuilt class''D20' engines, and also, in her early N.E. days as No. 592 she was stationed at Edinburgh, for working the East Coast trains to Newcastle, with Driver John Graham, who was later promoted to Night Running Foreman at Bank Top, Darlington. One thing peculiar to this engine was the absence of brass beading on the splasher above the rear driving wheels, which gave her an odd look. |
SLS/195412 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1888 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1152 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Waskerley (WAS) |
|
|
03/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9385 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69385 |
|
|
27/10/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69385 |
|
|