Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 589 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 3955 Week
» 589 Month
» 337435 Year
» 1559000 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 348 m/e 12/1888
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9384 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69384 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N802/1889
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 02/1889
Withdrawal During 03/1949
Service Life 60 yrs , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1889
CON Consett on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CON Consett on 20/01/1947
WDN CON Consett on 14/03/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock SLS/194701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1888 Renumbered Renumbered to 348    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9384    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Consett (CON)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69384 but not taken up    
03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9384    

prev