Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 125 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1262 Week
» 31552 Month
» 334742 Year
» 1556307 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 863 m/e 10/1888
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9380 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69380 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N811/1888
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gateshead Works
To Service During 11/1888
Withdrawal Sat 25/11/1950
Service Life 62 yrs , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1888
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 25/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 20/12/1947
WDN   on 20/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/02/1946 Detail Alterations B2 1671 has returned to Cambridge painted green, for Royal workings. 8783, one of the former Cambridge 'Royal' Clauds, has also been repainted green, and has been transferred to King's Lynn for working the Royal Train between there and Wolferton. Previously a black Lynn Claud, usually 8792, has been used on the Lynn-Wolferton part of the run. it is rumoured that a scheme is being prepared for altering the layout at King's Lynn by the completion of a triangle, which would enable Royal and other trains for the Hunstanton line to run through Lynn without reversing. 1671 is to be named 'Royal Sovereign,' a more appropriate name for its present duties than 'Manchester City.'
N.B. locos recently fitted with graduated steam brake and vacuum in place of Westinghouse include 9380 an 9772. J38 1421/44 have had the steam reverse replaced by screw.
SLS/194604

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1888 Renumbered Renumbered to 863    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9380    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69380 but not taken up    
25/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9380