Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 119 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1256 Week
» 31546 Month
» 334736 Year
» 1556301 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 859 m/e 11/1886
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9377 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69377 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N810/1888
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gateshead Works
To Service During 10/1888
Withdrawal Tue 28/06/1955
Service Life 66 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1888
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948
52B Heaton 5w/e 21/03/1953
   Withdrawn on 28/06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   on 28/06/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1886 Renumbered Renumbered to 859    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9377    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69377    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
28/06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69377    

prev prev