Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 120 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1257 Week
» 31547 Month
» 334737 Year
» 1556302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 212 m/e 06/1886
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9372 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69372 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N808/1886
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 08/1886
Withdrawal Mon 27/11/1950
Service Life 64 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1886
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 27/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 20/12/1947
WDN   on 27/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1886 Renumbered Renumbered to 212    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9372    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69372    
27/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 69372    

prev