Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 123 Today
» 1137 Yesterday
» 1260 Week
» 31550 Month
» 334740 Year
» 1556305 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 210 m/e 06/1886
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9371 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69371 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N807/1886
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 07/1886
Withdrawal Mon 10/03/1952
Service Life 65 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1886
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 10/03/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN HLB Hull Botanic Gardens on 24/11/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 20/12/1947
WDN   on 10/03/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1886 Renumbered Renumbered to 210    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9371    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69371    
10/03/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 69371    

prev