Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1083 Today
» 1104 Yesterday
» 3324 Week
» 33614 Month
» 336804 Year
» 1558369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2606 m/e 12/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9708 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69708 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1675
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal Fri 13/01/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1927
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
32G Melton Constable 4w/e 23/12/1950
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/10/1951
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 20/03/1954
30A Stratford 4w/e 23/10/1954
32D Yarmouth South Town 6w/e 25/12/1954
32C Lowestoft 5w/e 20/07/1957
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 19/10/1957
30A Stratford w/e 07/02/1959
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 30/01/1960
30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
   Withdrawn on 13/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn on 04/07/1947
ALLOC CAM Cambridge on 03/08/1947
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC MEL   4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 30/07/1950
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 13/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1936 Condensers removed
01/1954 Push and Pull Fitted
01/1954 Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2606
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1675
   
06/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9708    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69708    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/1954 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
01/1954 Modification Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector    
20/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69708    

prev prev