Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1111 Today
» 1104 Yesterday
» 3352 Week
» 33642 Month
» 336832 Year
» 1558397 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2605 m/e 11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9707 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69707 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1674
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Thu 27/04/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1927
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford w/e 10/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 27/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   on 27/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2605
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1674
   
07/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9707    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69707    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69707    

prev prev