Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 124 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6431 Week
» 21545 Month
» 324735 Year
» 1546300 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2602 m/e 11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9704 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 69704 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1671
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Tue 18/10/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1927
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
34C Hatfield 4w/e 20/09/1952
30A Stratford w/e 30/01/1960
   Withdrawn on 18/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN STR Stratford on 23/09/1948
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 18/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
25/03/1950 Stratford Works One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. SLS/195005
07/04/1951 Southend Line Owing to turntable repairs at Liverpool Street, there were no reasonable facilities for turning the B1 and B12 class engines which normally work the Southend trains. Since the Date: w/e 7th April, the service has been almost entirely worked by A5 engines transferred from Norwich and the North Eastern Region. Engines observed since this arrangement started are 68932/5/7/8/40/2. On occasions, these engines have not distinguished themselves, and N7 Tanks have had to take over at least twice. 69704 was observed running very fast with the 9.58 up on Saturday 21st April. No doubt, part of the difficulties being experienced with these engines are due to the crews having little knowledge of this type. Also, with the serious shortage of footplate men, young lads of 15-16 years of age, are often called out to fire these big machines. SLS/195106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2602
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1671
   
07/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9704    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69704    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
18/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69704    

prev prev