Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1078 Today
» 1104 Yesterday
» 3319 Week
» 33609 Month
» 336799 Year
» 1558364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2601 m/e 11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9703 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69703 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1670
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Thu 01/01/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1927
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/01/1951
   Withdrawn on 01/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 32B Ipswich w/e 20/08/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   on 01/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1958 Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2601
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1670
   
12/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9703    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69703    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69703    

prev prev