Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3042 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16448 Week
» 69464 Month
» 188991 Year
» 3215844 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2661 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9701 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69701 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
324 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 09/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/12/1960 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
16/07/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1933 |
Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
09/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2661 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 324 |
|
|
07/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
09/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9701 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69701 |
|
|
16/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69701 |
|
|