|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2654 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 317 |
||
09/1937 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9694 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) | ||
06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69694 | ||
16/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT) | ||
08/1949 | Modification | Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted | ||
27/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
28/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
19/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
23/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) | ||
08/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
23/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
22/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
24/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69694 |